THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:06:42 AM
Byron, Kevin Gerald
CPSO#:
86748
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chigamik Community Health Centre
287 Bayshore Drive
Midland ON L4R 0H1
Phone: (705) 527-4154
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle, Ontario
L0R 1H0
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN GERALD BYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |