skip to content

Burns, Gerard Michael

CPSO#: 20497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Active Care Medical Centre 1108 Klondike Road Kanata ON K2K 0G1 Phone: (613)-254-9777 Fax: (613)-254-9778
Date Received: 28 Oct 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 2014