THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:55:36 AM
Burns, Gerard Michael
CPSO#:
20497
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
28 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Feb 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Active Care Medical Centre
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON K2K 0G1
Phone: (613)-254-9777
Fax: (613)-254-9778
Date Received: 28 Oct 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jan 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2014 |