skip to content

Burke, Robert Clyve

CPSO#: 31491

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 May 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
4th Floor, Room 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

242, 1333 Sheppard Ave. E.
North York, ON
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416 4987874
Fax: 416 8501138
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert C. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burke ( CPSO# 31491 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 401
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suite 517
3800 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3P7
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 May 2016 Active
             Dr.   Robert   Clyve   Burke  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  adult
            otolaryngology, only.