THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:06:17 AM
Burke, Robert Clyve
CPSO#:
31491
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert C. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology and Head and Neck Surgery
600 University Ave., 4th Floor, Room 413
Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Instructions/Address:Department of Otolaryngology and Head and Neck Surgery
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 401 , 600 University Ave.
Toronto, ON, M5G 1X5
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |