skip to content

Budeci, Cristian Lucian

CPSO#: 87453

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 17 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 06 Nov 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jul 2008 to 16 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2011