THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:32:05 AM
Budeci, Cristian Lucian
CPSO#:
87453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2572 Boul Daniel-Johnson
suite 200
Laval QC H7T 2R3
Phone: 514-5894958
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 17 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 06 Nov 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 17 Jul 2008 to 16 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 17 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2011 |