skip to content

Brown-Cotterell, Tez Venetta Shevannese

CPSO#: 97130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2027
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) - 684-60 Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:18 Sep 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 17 Jan 2012
PEAP - R - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2012 to 01 Apr 2012
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 08 Feb 2017
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 15 Sep 2020
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2020 Active
 1. Dr. TEZ VENETTA SHEVANNESE BROWN-COTTERELL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. BROWN-COTTERELL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BROWN-COTTERELL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BROWN-COTTERELL's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BROWN-COTTERELL's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 18 September, 2020, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. BROWN-COTTERELL's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.