THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:28:39 AM
Brown-Cotterell, Tez Venetta Shevannese
CPSO#:
97130
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 17 Jan 2012
PEAP - R - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2012 to 01 Apr 2012
EL - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 08 Feb 2017
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 15 Sep 2020
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2020 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2020 |
|
Active |