skip to content

Brown, Morton Leonard

CPSO#: 21693

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Oct 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 328, 1333 Sheppard Ave E Toronto, ON M2J 1V1
Instructions: Please contact Dr. David Hajec
Date Received: 27 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 2017