THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:56:46 PM
Brown, Morton Leonard
CPSO#:
21693
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Oct 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. David Hajec
Suite 328, 1333 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto, ON M2J 1V1
Date Received: 27 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:22 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jan 2017 |