skip to content

Broomfield, Joel Alan Scott

CPSO#: 86406

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RSM Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 35056
Fax: (905) 721-6101 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Broomfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:14 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOEL ALAN SCOTT BROOMFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOMFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2013 to 13 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jul 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016