THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:07:20 PM
Broomfield, Joel Alan Scott
CPSO#:
86406
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
RSM Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 35056
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Broomfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:14 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL ALAN SCOTT BROOMFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOMFIELD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2013 to 13 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jul 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |