skip to content

Britto Sassi, Roberto

CPSO#: 90365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Youth Mental Health Progr
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
237 Barton St. E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77346
Fax: (905) 521-7963 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood Disorders Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35448
Fax: (905) 381-5629
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Sassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Britto Sassi ( CPSO# 90365 )
Dr. R. Sassi ( CPSO# 105755)

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:10 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERTO BRITTO SASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTO SASSI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2021