THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:48:27 AM
Britto Sassi, Roberto
CPSO#:
90365
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Sassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2023 |