skip to content

Bowle-Evans, Jo Ann

CPSO#: 21830

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Dec 2022
EXPIRY DATE
08 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Dec 2022

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from August 8, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jo Ann Bowle-Evans in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bowle-Evans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: The College has received information regarding Dr. Bowle-Evans’s standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Bowle-Evans has restricted her practice as follows:
Dr. Bowle-Evans will not prescribe ivermectin or nitazoxanide.
Dr. Bowle-Evans will not prescribe hydroxychloroquine, doxycycline, azithromycin or prednisone in relation to COVID-19.