THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 0:24:34 AM
Bowle-Evans, Jo Ann
CPSO#:
21830
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 10, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jo Ann Bowle-Evans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 10th, 2023:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bowle-Evans in her family medicine and psychotherapy practice and conduct, including in relation to her prescribing of Ivermectin for the COVID-19, engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Bowle-Evans resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.