skip to content

Bourque, Jean-Marc

CPSO#: 91925

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:27 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2017