THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:42:46 PM
Bourque, Jean-Marc
CPSO#:
91925
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |