skip to content

Boet, Sylvain

CPSO#: 88292

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite De Rouen, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: 613-737-8189 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sylvain Boet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boet ( CPSO# 88292 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:14 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 May 2008 to 11 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Sylvain Boet may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Pain Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
                        Boet  holds  an academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Boet no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.