THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:05:40 AM
Boet, Sylvain
CPSO#:
88292
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite De Rouen, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: 613-737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Jun 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 May 2008 to 11 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2018 |
|
Active |