skip to content

Bock, Dirk Erich

CPSO#: 90228

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dirk Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bock ( CPSO# 90228 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East, P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8824

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2020