THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:25:06 AM
Bock, Dirk Erich
CPSO#:
90228
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dirk Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2020 |