skip to content

Boba, Lukasz Marek

CPSO#: 87813

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
535 Mulock Drive
Suite 330
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone: (289)903-1000
Fax: (289)663-0999 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5293 Highway 7 East, Suite 209
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Canada
Phone: (289)903-1000
Fax: (289)663-0999
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Boba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boba ( CPSO# 87813 )

Business Address:
330 - 535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (289) 903-1000

Business Address:
209-5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone Number: (289) 903-1000

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKASZ MAREK BOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
CF - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010