THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:57:23 PM
Boba, Lukasz Marek
CPSO#:
87813
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
38-16945 Leslie St
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Phone: 289-903-1000
Fax: 289-663-0999
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUKASZ MAREK BOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2010 |