skip to content

Birnboim, Hymie

CPSO#: 21121

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1552 Featherston Dr Ottawa ON K1H 6P2 OR (after 2019-07-15): 30 Lower Village Gate Toronto ON M5P 3L7
Date Received: 29 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hymie Birnboim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 28, 2019:

Dr. Birnboim has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.