THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:56:37 PM
Birnboim, Hymie
CPSO#:
21121
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1552 Featherston Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 6P2
OR (after 2019-07-15):
30 Lower Village Gate
Toronto ON M5P 3L7
Date Received: 29 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hymie Birnboim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 28, 2019:
Dr. Birnboim has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.