skip to content

Bharucha, Pheroze Noshir

CPSO#: 86157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-0323
Fax: (905) 697-0230 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bharucha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bharucha ( CPSO# 86157 )

Business Address:
2100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-0323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHEROZE NOSHIR BHARUCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARUCHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010