THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:46:06 AM
Bharucha, Pheroze Noshir
CPSO#:
86157
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-0323
Fax: (905) 697-0230
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bharucha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2022
Corporation Name: Dr. Bharucha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 20 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHEROZE NOSHIR BHARUCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARUCHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 18, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Pheroze Bharucha was charged with the following offence:
1. Sexual Assault, on or about July 26, 2023, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: September 14, 2023
Place of Charge: Oshawa, Ontario
Durham Regional Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 18, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 14, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Pheroze Bharucha:
1. Bharucha must attend a specified Police Station, in person and fill out a change of address form within 24 hours of any change of residential address.
2. Bharucha must abstain from communicating or associating, directly or indirectly, with a named person.
3. Bharucha must remain 100 metres away from any place of residence, employment, education, worship or any other place a named person is known to be.