skip to content

Bernstein, Leora Ruth

CPSO#: 95080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON   Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Leora Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bernstein ( CPSO# 95080 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:05 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEORA RUTH BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018