THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:44:03 AM
Bernstein, Leora Ruth
CPSO#:
95080
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEORA RUTH BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 09 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2018 |