skip to content

Berman, Graham

CPSO#: 23212

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 12-Nov-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Berman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017


Address: Medical record requests may be sent to the following address: Apartment 8A 1 Chedington Place Toronto, ON M4N 3R4
Date Received: 15 Nov 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:29 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2012