THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:53:33 AM
Berman, Graham
CPSO#:
23212
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Oct 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Nov-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Berman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests may be sent to the following address:
Apartment 8A
1 Chedington Place
Toronto, ON
M4N 3R4
Date Received: 15 Nov 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2012 |