skip to content

Bentov, Yaakov Haim

CPSO#: 85509

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yaakov Bentov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Yaakov Haim Bentov to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 5, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bentov engaged in professional misconduct, including sexual abuse. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Bentov resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)