THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:07:16 PM
Bentov, Yaakov Haim
CPSO#:
85509
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yaakov Bentov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Mar 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Yaakov Haim Bentov to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 5, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bentov engaged in professional misconduct, including sexual abuse. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Bentov resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)