skip to content

Bedessee, Manwel

CPSO#: 22919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Manwel Bedessee PO Box 48009 Kitchener, Ontario N2E 4K6
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Mrs. Daphne Bedessee Tel: 519-696-3993
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2008