THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:06:09 AM
Bedessee, Manwel
CPSO#:
22919
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Durham, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Manwel Bedessee
PO Box 48009
Kitchener, Ontario
N2E 4K6
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Mrs. Daphne Bedessee
Tel: 519-696-3993
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |