skip to content

Bawazir, Mohammed Abdullah Salem

CPSO#: 95840

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aden University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4383 Portage Rd
Unit B100
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: (289) 477-0324
Fax: 289 477 0327 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 206
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Canada
Phone: 905-625-5600
Fax: 905-625-5650
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Bawazir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bawazir ( CPSO# 95840 )

Business Address:
206-1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Business Address:
5845 Ferry Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S8
Phone Number: (289) 296-1898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:04 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018