THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:06:24 AM
Bawazir, Mohammed Abdullah Salem
CPSO#:
95840
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Aden University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4383 Portage Rd
Unit B100
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6A6
Phone: (289) 477-0324
Fax: 289 477 0327
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:04 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |