skip to content

Bawazeer, Mohammed Abdullah Salem

CPSO#: 96511

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Washington St
Tufts Medical Center
Department of Surgery, Division of
Box 4488
Boston MA  02111-1552
United States

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014