THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:55:14 AM
Bawazeer, Mohammed Abdullah Salem
CPSO#:
96511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Washington St
Tufts Medical Center
Department of Surgery, Division of
Box 4488
Boston MA 02111-1552
United States
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZEER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2014 |