skip to content

Bassuni, Wafaa Y S

CPSO#: 85758

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Dec 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jan 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
CF - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007