THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:08:06 AM
Bassuni, Wafaa Y S
CPSO#:
85758
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Transfusion Medicine
McMaster University, 31 Jan 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
CF - Transfusion Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2007 |