skip to content

Baron, Murray

CPSO#: 31619

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2007