THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:08:24 AM
Baron, Murray
CPSO#:
31619
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2007 |