skip to content

Barnett, Rebecca Patricia

CPSO#: 98069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
EXPIRY DATE
16 Nov 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 19025 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA PATRICIA BARNETT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BARNETT is enrolled at WESTERN UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BARNETT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BARNETT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BARNETT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BARNETT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BARNETT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 16 Nov 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 16 Nov 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 16 Nov 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2021