THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:00:19 AM
Barnett, Rebecca Patricia
CPSO#:
98069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Western University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 19025
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA PATRICIA BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 16 Nov 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 16 Nov 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2021 |