skip to content

Barnett, John Richard

CPSO#: 22546

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Otago, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Richard Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2012