THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:47:45 PM
Barnett, John Richard
CPSO#:
22546
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jan 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of Otago, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Richard Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:02 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1970 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2012 |