skip to content

Barnes, Alison Gabrielle

CPSO#: 88909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Centre
2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON GABRIELLE BARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015